California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill June 27, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012