07/03/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
07/02/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 3707.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3598.) (May 24). | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/26/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3230.) (April 18). | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |