LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB152
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB152
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB152
Compare Versions
SB152 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB152 Enrolled August 26, 2011
SB152 Amended May 25, 2011
SB152 Amended April 25, 2011
SB152 Amended March 10, 2011
SB152 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB152 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB152 Enrolled August 26, 2011
SB152 Amended May 25, 2011
SB152 Amended April 25, 2011
SB152 Amended March 10, 2011
SB152 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare