|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 847, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5008.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6460.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6254.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3649.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3598.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3308.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|