07/05/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3649.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/25/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3598.) (May 24). | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3306.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |