California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 29, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012