LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB153
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB153
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB153
Action History
01/31/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/26/2011
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 7. Page 738.) Reconsideration granted.
04/14/2011
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
03/15/2011
Set for hearing April 26.
02/10/2011
Referred to Com. on G.O.
02/03/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
02/02/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.