05/25/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3598.) (May 24). | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/14/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3232.) (April 18). | |||
04/12/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
04/11/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/27/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |