California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2012

Amended

Bill May 1, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012