06/14/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/06/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/14/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3460.) (May 8). | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing May 8. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |