05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/21/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/11/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/10/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |