|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 458, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4982.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6462.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3650.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3598.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3230.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|