07/17/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/17/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/05/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |||
07/02/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/02/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 5558.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 19). | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 3403.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3302.) (April 25). | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |