07/02/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
06/18/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/11/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 3467.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/08/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 30. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing March 27. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |