|
09/29/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. (Corrected September 11.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6772.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3428.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3190.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|