04/17/2012 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |