|
06/15/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 5201.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 3396.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3144.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|