01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
08/15/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
07/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/29/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 430.) (March 23). | |||
03/15/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/03/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/03/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | |||
02/02/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |