|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4630.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5972.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3427.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3208.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|