05/21/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3313.) | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |