|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 578, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 5115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6667.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6555.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6251.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5388.) Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5388.)
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3750.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3599.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3232.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|