LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1569
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1569
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1569
Action History
05/21/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/24/2012
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3313.)
03/27/2012
Set for hearing April 24.
03/22/2012
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
02/27/2012
Read first time.
02/26/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
02/24/2012
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.