LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1570
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1570
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1570
Action History
05/08/2012
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
05/02/2012
Set for hearing May 8.
03/28/2012
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
03/22/2012
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. Set for hearing March 27.
02/27/2012
Read first time.
02/26/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
02/24/2012
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.