LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1572
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1572
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1572
Compare Versions
SB1572 Amended August 31, 2012
SB1572 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1572 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1572 Amended June 25, 2012
SB1572 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1572 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1572 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1572 Amended August 31, 2012
SB1572 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1572 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1572 Amended June 25, 2012
SB1572 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1572 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1572 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare