|
08/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 227, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5972.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3472.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3264.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|