LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB16
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB16
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB16
Compare Versions
SB16 Chaptered September 22, 2011
SB16 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB16 Amended August 25, 2011
SB16 Amended August 22, 2011
SB16 Amended June 30, 2011
SB16 Amended May 27, 2011
SB16 Amended April 12, 2011
SB16 Amended March 29, 2011
SB16 Amended February 15, 2011
SB16 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB16 Chaptered September 22, 2011
SB16 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB16 Amended August 25, 2011
SB16 Amended August 22, 2011
SB16 Amended June 30, 2011
SB16 Amended May 27, 2011
SB16 Amended April 12, 2011
SB16 Amended March 29, 2011
SB16 Amended February 15, 2011
SB16 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare