06/21/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/21/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
07/06/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/24/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/23/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1085.) (May 23). | |||
05/16/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
04/25/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 12). | |||
03/30/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
02/03/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | |||
02/02/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |