|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2462.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 3114.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2769.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1251.) (June 1). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 1177.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|