|
02/02/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 2333.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 900.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 543.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 358.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|