01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 761.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/12/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and B. & F.R. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |