|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 586, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2148.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2582.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 854.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|