06/14/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |||
06/06/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
01/19/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/19/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2680.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
01/12/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/11/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2638.) (January 11). | |||
01/06/2012 | Set for hearing January 11. | |||
05/03/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
03/24/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/16/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/07/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. | |||
02/03/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |