|
07/06/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1223.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1113.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 617.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|