|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 331, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2144.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2505.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2447.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1085.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 675.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|