06/28/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/28/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
04/14/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 652.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/12/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/11/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 599.) (April 11). | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 414.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
03/10/2011 | Set for hearing March 21. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
02/08/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | |||
02/07/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |