LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB179
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB179
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB179
Compare Versions
SB179 Chaptered September 29, 2011
SB179 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB179 Amended August 26, 2011
SB179 Amended July 13, 2011
SB179 Introduced February 7, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB179 Chaptered September 29, 2011
SB179 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB179 Amended August 26, 2011
SB179 Amended July 13, 2011
SB179 Introduced February 7, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare