|
07/12/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2190.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2091.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 878.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 764.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|