|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 739, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2633.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 705.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 358.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|