02/01/2012 | Died on third reading. | |||
01/24/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/23/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
07/01/2011 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Leno. | |||
06/02/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 18. Page 1279.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1279.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 864.) (May 3). | |||
04/04/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/08/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | |||
02/07/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |