California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill June 13, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill April 7, 2011