09/08/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
09/02/2011 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
08/22/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/18/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17). | |||
07/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1176.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/17/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1013.) (May 16). | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 852.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
02/09/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |