|
09/30/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 5130.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 5097.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4994.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 6570.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6259.) Ordered to third reading. (Corrected August 28.)
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5389.)
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1224.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1114.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|