|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 121, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1749.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 2188.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 702.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 495.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|