|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2718.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2685.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2624.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|