|
09/29/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 5005.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 6579.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6266.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 22).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5344.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 985.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 761.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|