|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2742.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1114.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|