LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB216
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB216
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB216
Compare Versions
SB216 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB216 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB216 Amended August 26, 2011
SB216 Amended July 5, 2011
SB216 Amended May 31, 2011
SB216 Amended April 25, 2011
SB216 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB216 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB216 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB216 Amended August 26, 2011
SB216 Amended July 5, 2011
SB216 Amended May 31, 2011
SB216 Amended April 25, 2011
SB216 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare