|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2459.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 30. Page 3018.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2712.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1225.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1114.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 761.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 496.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|