LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB224
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB224
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB224
Compare Versions
SB224 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB224 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB224 Amended September 1, 2011
SB224 Amended April 14, 2011
SB224 Amended March 17, 2011
SB224 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB224 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB224 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB224 Amended September 1, 2011
SB224 Amended April 14, 2011
SB224 Amended March 17, 2011
SB224 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare