01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/02/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/23/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/11/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 949.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/05/2011 | Joint Rule 61(a)(2) suspended. (Page 871.) Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/28/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/10/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |||
02/09/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |